WHIZZ KIDZ @ JEROME
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Whizz Kidz @ Jerome provides Nursery Education to 3 year olds and wrap-around day care for 3 to 11 year olds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2015
Total income includes £30,021 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 30 May 2006: Standard registration
- 01 September 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- LITTLE JEMS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 30/09/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.67k | £66.99k | £50.60k | £51.94k | £60.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.61k | £58.46k | £64.03k | £57.45k | £53.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £30.02k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | 20 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2015
(These accounts |
20 July 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 29 June 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | 29 June 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/07/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18/08/2010
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE HIGH QUALITY DAY CARE FOR CHILDREN FROM THE AGE OF THREE YEARS. TO PROVIDE INTEGRATED EDUCATION AND DAY CARE ON THE SAME SITE BY MAKING FACILITIES AND SERVICES AVAILABLE TO CHILDREN DURING LUNCH TIME AND THE OTHER HALF OF THE DAY TO THEIR FREE NURSERY PLACE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, STAFFORDSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window