HER EQUALITY RIGHTS AND AUTONOMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help female survivors of trafficking, conflict and other forms of exploitation and young women vulnerable to trafficking become economically self-sufficient to prevent re-trafficking. To improve these women survivors social and professional support networks. To increase public awareness of the plight of trafficked and women vulnerable to trafficking and other forms of exploitation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 31 July 2006: Standard registration
- HER EQUALITY, RIGHTS AND AUTONOMY (Previous name)
- THE WOMEN TO WORK INITIATIVE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gilli Coston | Trustee | 09 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Newstead | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maninder Paul | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.99k | £72.51k | £86.58k | £77.41k | £69.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.60k | £47.08k | £67.14k | £68.62k | £105.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £35.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 December 2022 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 December 2022 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/07/2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 02/02/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22/02/2013
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF FORMERLY TRAFFICKED WOMEN AND YOUNG WOMEN VULNERABLE TO TRAFFICKING BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND MENTORING AND SUCH OTHER SUPPORT AS MAY BE DEEMED CHARITABLE AT LAW. (2) TO ADVANCE KNOWLEDGE OF THE CAUSES AND EFFECTS OF VIOLENCE AGAINST WOMEN BOTH 'DOMESTIC VIOLENCE' AND TRAFFICKING AND THE PREVENTION THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Cumnor Road
Farmoor
OXFORD
OX2 9NS
- Phone:
- 07860111555
- Email:
- info@hera-uk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window