Palliative Care Sierra Leone

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity supports the Shepherd's Hospice and The Connaught CPU in Freetown, Sierra Leone, by making grants to it, supporting a visiting doctor, and making occasional visits. Funds are raised by a variety of fundraising events, and from donations from individuals and organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Surrey
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 06 April 2006: Standard registration
- UKFTSH (Working name)
- THE UK FRIENDS OF THE SHEPHERD'S HOSPICE (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RUTH ELIZABETH CECIL | Chair |
|
||||||
BARRY HITCHENS | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||
ESTHER DOROTHY WALKER MBE BSc | Trustee | 09 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE ANNE BOULTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL RICHARD HURTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.74k | £25.72k | £11.76k | £17.20k | £23.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.49k | £17.77k | £12.62k | £26.40k | £20.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5 JANUARY 2006 as amended on 08 Aug 2016 as amended on 25 Feb 2019 as amended on 09 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
(i) The promotion of the charitable purposes of The Shepherd?s Hospice in Sierra Leone and (ii) The advancement of health by supporting the development of palliative care in Sierra Leone in particular but not exclusively by making grants to the Hospice or to other organisations or individuals in Sierra Leone and by facilitating visits to the Hospice or other providers of palliative care in that country by healthcare professionals from the United Kingdom or elsewhere.
Area of benefit
SIERRA LEONE
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 PALACE ROAD
EAST MOLESEY
KT8 9DL
- Phone:
- 02087831998
- Email:
- ukftsh@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window