Accounts and annual returns JAMESTOWN UK FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1114567
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2009 26 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2009 30 September 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 January 2008 19 January 2009 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2008 28 November 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 January 2007 14 October 2008 319 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2007 15 November 2007 On Time