JAMESTOWN UK FOUNDATION LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rule of Law Lectures Virginia Indian Festival The Discovery Tour Journey to the New World London 1606 - Virginia 1607 Exhibition Smithsonian Folklife Festival 2007
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 June 2006: Standard registration
- 23 August 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2007 | 31/01/2008 | 30/04/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £361.87k | £58.12k | £1.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £194.87k | £147.64k | £61.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2009 | 26 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2009 | 30 September 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2008 | 19 January 2009 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2008 | 28 November 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2007 | 14 October 2008 | 319 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2007 | 15 November 2007 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 JANUARY 2006
Charitable objects
1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR IN RELATION TO THE FIRST PERMANENT ENGLISH SETTLEMENT IN AMERICA; AND 2 SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE (IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DEFINITION OF 'CHARITABLE' AS DEFINED IN ARTICLE 2.1(E) OF THE ARTICLES).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window