THE NUCLEAR EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity now commissions its own work, aiming to influence decision makers. It no longer accepts new grant applications and will now only consider extending existing grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 March 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Barwick | Chair | 03 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Claire Poyner | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Laurence Blaney | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anna Shielagh Shelley Liddle | Trustee | 26 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Burt | Trustee | 18 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr LINDA HUGL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.92k | £15.11k | £53.55k | £32.58k | £13.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.21k | £32.77k | £2.19k | £33.60k | £31.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 AUGUST 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15 JULY 2007.
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY (THE "OBJECTS") ARE:- (A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROMOTING THE STUDY AND UNDERSTANDING OF AND RESEARCH INTO ARMS CONTROL AND DISARMAMENT, DEFENCE AND SECURITY, WITH AN EMPHASIS ON NUCLEAR WEAPONS AND OTHER WEAPONS OF MASS DESTRUCTION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 Arrivato Plaza
Hall Street
ST. HELENS
Merseyside
WA10 1GH
- Phone:
- 01926831664
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window