Financial history WILLIAM CHOWN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1113639
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £14.99k £35.62k £9.29k £9.77k £162.14k
Total expenditure £100 £104.51k £8.15k £17.10k £234.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A