Accounts and annual returns BBG - BUILDING FUTURES

Charity number: 1115062
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 November 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 March 2022 148 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 March 2022 513 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 March 2022 879 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required