Financial history THE PORTSMOUTH WORLD WAR II MEMORIAL FUND

Charity Number: 1114162
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £2.97k £42.02k £9.30k £2.63k £2.63k
Total expenditure £0 £25.26k £24.37k £2.63k £2.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A