FRIENDS OF GILLESPIE PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FoG aims to advance the education and quality of life of pupils of Gillespie Primary School and their families. It builds relationships across the Gillespie community with a number of projects. The main aim for this year, is to enhance play areas, improving them for community use and assisting with the greening and improved suitability of the school's building and environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Islington
Governance
- 21 March 2006: Standard registration
- GILLESPIE SCHOOL HSA (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Mary Stokes | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Anne Kavanagh Collins | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Handscombe | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Grant | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Max Priestman | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Hatchett | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sean Thomson | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Barrett | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.11k | £29.58k | £14.37k | £31.11k | £24.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.68k | £14.54k | £40.99k | £18.10k | £24.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 November 2021 | 152 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/01/2006 AS AMENDED ON 15/07/2011 as amended on 20 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. GILLESPIE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gillespie School
Gillespie Road
London
N5 1LH
- Phone:
- 07910657389
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window