Financial history PRECIOUS BLOOD INTERNATIONAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1114373
Charity reporting is overdue by 898 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/02/2017 06/02/2018 06/02/2019 06/02/2020 06/02/2021
Total gross income £1.00k £1.50k £650 £1.20k £0
Total expenditure £800 £1.61k £420 £1.10k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A