CLEARED GROUND DEMINING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cleared Ground's activities are to relieve suffering and distress in those parts of the world affected by the presence of landmines, Unexploded Ordnance (UXO) and other Explosive Remnants of War (ERW).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Palau
Governance
- 19 May 2006: Standard registration
- CLEARED GROUD DEMINING LIMITED (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHELE ANN O'LEARY | Trustee | 04 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD JAMES DAVID HARRIS | Trustee | 04 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN ROGER COE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CASSANDRA JANET MCKEOWN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £149.25k | £8.98k | £72 | £5.36k | £267 | |
|
Total expenditure | £307.27k | £71.07k | £45.80k | £0 | £10.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 December 2024 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 JANUARY 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 5 MAY 2006.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO: RELIEVE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS IN THOSE PARTS OF THE WORLD AFFECTED BY THE PRESENCE OF LANDMINES, UNEXPLODED ORDNANCE AND OTHER REMNANTS OF WAR ("RELEVANT MATERIALS"), WHEREBY UNEXPLODED ORDNANCE CAN BE DEFINED AS EXPLOSIVE ORDNANCE THAT HAS BEEN PRIMED, FUSED, ARMED OR OTHERWISE PREPARED FOR USE OR USED, AND THAT MAY HAVE BEEN FIRED, DROPPED, LAUNCHED OR PROJECTED YET REMAINS UNEXPLODED EITHER THROUGH MALFUNCTION OR DESIGN OR FOR ANY OTHER REASON, AND REMNANTS OF WAR MEANS UNEXPLODED ORDNANCE AND ABANDONED EXPLOSIVE ORDNANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 24/B
Cygnet House
188 Kings Road
London
SW3 5XR
- Phone:
- 02073510998
- Email:
- enquiries@clearedground.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window