Financial history CHRIST CHURCH BLACKBURN TRUST

Charity number: 1114543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £20.04k £20.16k £19.49k £20.55k £21.53k
Total expenditure £26.80k £26.73k £7.50k £3.79k £10.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A