WHITE HART COMMUNITY GROUPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Volunteer Centre North Warwickshire promotes and develops volunteering for the benefit of individuals and the local community focusing on the most disadvantaged members of society Its main activities are brokerage, development of volunteering opportunities, marketing, good practice development, commenting and campaigning and strategic development of volunteering. .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,250 from 4 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 17 March 2006: Standard registration
- VOLUNTEER CENTRE NORTH WARWICKSHIRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Horner | Chair | 07 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Neil Dirveiks | Trustee | 18 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Michelle Susan Black | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nigel John Dyson | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Silifa Williams | Trustee | 23 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN SHORT | Trustee | 16 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.42k | £43.54k | £58.84k | £41.37k | £38.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.75k | £27.66k | £33.01k | £50.39k | £50.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £20.94k | £1.27k | £1.60k | £2.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 26 AUG 2020
Charitable objects
TO UNDERTAKE AND ARRANGE VOLUNTARY WORK IN EDUCATION, SOCIAL SERVICE AND SIMILAR CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AMONG THOSE IN NEED
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. NORTH WARWICKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
WHITE HART HOUSE
LONG STREET
ATHERSTONE
CV9 1AX
- Phone:
- 01827 946458
- Email:
- MARTIN.HORNERVCNW@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window