FRIENDS OF WHINFELL QUARRY GARDEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects are:- 1). To restore, preserve, improve and maintain the area known as "Whinfell Quarry Garden" for the benefit of the public. 2). To advance the education of the public, concerning the history and other matters relating to "Whinfell Quarry Garden".
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 30 May 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Fletcher | Chair | 17 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert William King | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Josie McCulloch | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Ellin | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard John Barnes | Trustee | 17 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Elizabeth Winn | Trustee | 17 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Richard Fletcher | Trustee | 17 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Shaun Quegan | Trustee | 17 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Samuel James Shearstone | Trustee | 17 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Henry Winn | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.25k | £4.08k | £3.39k | £3.65k | £3.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.53k | £3.43k | £2.87k | £3.63k | £4.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 NOVEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO RESTORE, PRESERVE, IMPROVE AND MAINTAIN THE AREA KNOWN AS WHINFELL QUARRY GARDEN FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE HISTORY AND OTHER MATTERS RELATING TO WHINFELL QUARRY GARDEN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, SOUTH YORKSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Whirlow Elms Chase
SHEFFIELD
S11 9SW
- Phone:
- 01142369332
- Email:
- fletcher262@icloud.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window