Trustees FRIENDS OF WHINFELL QUARRY GARDEN
Charity number: 1114406

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Fletcher | Chair | 17 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert William King | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Josie McCulloch | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Ellin | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard John Barnes | Trustee | 17 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Elizabeth Winn | Trustee | 17 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Richard Fletcher | Trustee | 17 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Shaun Quegan | Trustee | 17 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Samuel James Shearstone | Trustee | 17 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Henry Winn | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.