LITTLE FISHES NURSERY, THE CHURCH OF THE RESURRECTION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide Nursery education for children from two to 5 years of age.The children learn through play using the Foundation Phase initiative and encourage independence. We welcome everyone whatever their ethnicity or additional need. The Nursery is governed by a Management Committee but has a Manager for the day-to-day work. It is funded by fees, grants and fund-raising activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Cardiff
Governance
- 05 April 2006: Standard registration
- 02 September 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
- LITTLE FISHES NURSERY (Working name)
- THE CHURCH OF THE RESURRECTION LITTLE FISHES NURSERY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.08k | £33.86k | £44.81k | £45.14k | £42.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.97k | £32.98k | £38.76k | £43.36k | £44.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 23 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 23 October 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 19 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 19 October 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 05 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2017
(These accounts |
05 January 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/10/2004 AS AMENDED ON 13/05/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 09 OCT 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY: (A) PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY, IN WHICH PARENTS HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE PART (B) THERE BEING A SPIRITUAL ETHOS WITHIN EACH SESSION (C) ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP THE CHILDREN
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window