Accounts and annual returns NUNEATON AND WARWICKSHIRE WILDLIFE SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1116741
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 March 2024 11 February 2025 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2024 11 February 2025 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 March 2023 10 February 2025 377 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2023 10 February 2025 377 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 March 2022 10 February 2025 742 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2022 10 February 2025 742 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 March 2021 25 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2021 25 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 March 2020 09 February 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2020 09 February 2021 10 days late Download Open in new window