THE GEM FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants given to children with disabilities and their families to provide special equipment, training, holidays etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Birmingham City
- Norfolk
Governance
- 29 June 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROLE FRANCES MCLEOD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MEGAN WEIR-CUTTING | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MILLIGEN MCLEOD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.97k | £8.56k | £8.12k | £9.91k | £9.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.27k | £8.49k | £8.02k | £9.54k | £8.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 August 2024 | 188 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 4 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEED OF YOUNG PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO ASSIST WITH THEIR DAILY CARE AND/OR TO ENHANCE THEIR LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NORFOLK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
G E M TRUST
PO BOX 1125
STALHAM
NORWICH
NR12 9WX
- Phone:
- 07775808159
- Email:
- gemfoundation2006@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window