GOSPEL SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to support Christians and Christian charities in a practical way;
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 May 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ESTHER VAN DER SPOEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ASTRID VAN DER SPOEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEES VAN DER SPOEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.00k | £16.50k | £16.38k | £16.10k | £54.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.35k | £19.05k | £7.35k | £10.17k | £25.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20 DECEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT CHRISTIAN MISSIONARIES; TO COMPLEMENT THE SKILLS OF MISSIONARIES; TO EXPRESS THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN A LOVING AND PRACTICAL WAY; TO BRING PEOPLE BY GOD'S STRENGTH AND GRACE TO A SAVING KNOWLEDGE OF CHRIST.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CASTLE VILLA
HAYSCASTLE
HAVERFORDWEST
SA62 5AA
- Phone:
- 01348831352
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window