RAMA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To develop the capacities and the skills of members of socially and / or economically disadvantaged communities in all parts of the world (and particularly in India) in such a way as they are better able to identify, and help meet their needs and to participate more fully in society. 2. To advance education, health care and to aid in the relief of poverty in any part of the world (and particula
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- India
Governance
- 12 May 2006: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 16 November 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr PRIYANKA PATEL | Chair | 17 December 2005 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Dayment | Trustee | 17 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
PETER WESTLAKE | Trustee | 17 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
MUNISH DATTA | Trustee | 17 December 2005 |
|
|||||
KOMILLA DATTA | Trustee | 17 December 2005 |
|
|
||||
NIKIN PATEL | Trustee | 17 December 2005 |
|
|
||||
ARTIKA DATTA | Trustee | 17 December 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.60k | £8.06k | £12.92k | £9.49k | £15.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.72k | £15.60k | £17.11k | £20.80k | £21.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 February 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 JANUARY 2006.
Charitable objects
(1) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITIES AND THE SKILLS OF MEMBERS OF SOCIALLY AND/OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN ALL PARTS OF THE WORLD (AND PARTICULARLY IN INDIA) IN SUCH A WAY AS THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, HEALTH CARE AND TO AID IN THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD (AND PARTICULARLY IN INDIA), AND FOR THOSE PURPOSES ONLY: (1) TO SEND VOLUNTEERS TO OTHER COUNTRIES TO SHARE AND DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING AND TO SHARE THEIR EXPERIENCE WITH OTHERS ON RETURN; (2) TO UNDERTAKE OR ASSIST IN WORKS AND PROJECTS OF ALL KINDS; AND (3) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE NATURE, CAUSES AND EFFECTS OF SUCH POVERTY AND SUFFERING. (3) TO PAY OR APPLY OR CAUSE TO BE PAID OR APPLIED THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE FOUNDATION TO SUCH CHARITIES OR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS IN SUCH MANNER AND SUBJECT TO SUCH TERMS, CONDITIONS AS THE FOUNDATION MAY DETERMINE AND TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
IN ALL PARTS OF THE WORLD (AND PARTICULARLY IN INDIA).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rama Krippa
14 Hauxton Road
Trumpington
CAMBRIDGE
CB2 9LT
- Phone:
- 01223 474530
- Email:
- rama.foundation@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window