Walsall Eyes

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
W'EYES is a campaigning group for blind and visually impaired people of Walsall. At meetings we provide accessible information, education plus leisure and social activities for those visually impaired people who find it difficult to cope with their disability. We have an invited speaker at our monthly meetings and all who would like to come are welcome at our meetings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Walsall
Governance
- 19 June 2006: Standard registration
- W'EYES (WALSALL CONSUMER GROUP FOR BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED PEOPLE) (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Craig Robert Bates | Trustee | 04 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Denise Tracey Dewhurst | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Alan Davis | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Harjit Kaur Hayer | Trustee | 03 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN JOHN MELLOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £79 | £0 | £200 | £2.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.09k | £500 | £334 | £133 | £1.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 MARCH 2005 as amended on 16 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE BLIND OR PARTIALLY SIGHTED IN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF WALSALL AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, ADVICE, INFORMATION, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND SUCH OTHER SERVICES, WITH A VIEW TO ASSISTING SUCH PERSONS TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND ENHANCE THEIR ABILITY TO PLAY A FULL AND CONSTRUCTIVE ROLE IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF WALSALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 TREHURST AVENUE
BIRMINGHAM
B42 2PU
- Phone:
- 07814262895
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window