THE VERONICA AWDRY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes although the trust has 3 particular areas of interest : young people's education especially music education, heritage railway projects and outdoor and rural pursuits. The trust provides grants to individuals and other charitable organisations and particulary welcomes applications from those based in Devon, especially the Newton Abbott area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 March 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Wensley Stock | Trustee | 29 April 2015 |
|
|||||
VERONICA CHAMBERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLAIRE VERONICA CHAMBERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD IAN CHAMBERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK RICHARD CHAMBERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.71k | £77.49k | £79.78k | £87.99k | £91.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.38k | £83.46k | £109.15k | £94.71k | £92.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 SEPTEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO PURSUE CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wansbroughs Solicitors
Northgate House
Northgate Street
DEVIZES
SN10 1JX
- Phone:
- 01380733300
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window