WHETSTONE WANDERERS YOUTH FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity Number: 1122502
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide football for under privileged children.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £9,538
Total expenditure: £9,401

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnet

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 January 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALAN KELSEY Chair
None on record
cara Demetriades Trustee 26 April 2020
None on record
JOSEPH IAN McGILLVRAY Trustee 26 April 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £170.26k £4.20k £0 £16.92k £9.54k
Total expenditure £182.89k £9.74k £0 £240 £9.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 15 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 22 September 2024 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 09 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 17 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 20 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 20 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
29 ALAN DRIVE
BARNET
EN5 2PP
Phone:
07470083118