NCBI LONDON LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A charity being wound down by its trustees. It formerly promoted Equality, human rights, and the advantages of an open and plural society; in-line with protected characteristics in the Equality Act 2010. This was delivered through educational workshops and bespoke consultancy services to the corporate, public, and third sector.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 May 2006: Standard registration
- 08 June 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.72k | £7.86k | £16.42k | £11.98k | £277 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.03k | £8.87k | £16.23k | £7.94k | £6.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | £575 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 November 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 December 2020 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 02 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 OCTOBER 2005.
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY TRAINING THE PUBLIC TO RECOGNISE FACTORS WHICH GIVE RISE TO PREJUDICE AND DISCRIMINATION BY REASON OF GENDER, CLASS, PHYSICAL ABILITY, NATIONALITY, ABILITY, RACIAL, RELIGIOUS, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, SOCIAL OR EDUCATIONAL BACKGROUNDS, AS WELL AS TEACHING THEM THE SKILLS AND STRATEGIES NEEDED TO RESOLVE AND ELIMINATE UNFAIR OR UNREASONABLE PREJUDICE AND DISCRIMINATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window