TURKISH FORUM UK TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefit of the Turkish community in the UK without distinction of sex or political, religious or other opinions by associating with voluntary organisations and inhabitants in a common effort to provide facilities to improve their conditions of life and to assist their integration into wider community so that they may participate fully in society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 April 2006: Standard registration
- TFUKT (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NAZIF AKPINAR | Trustee | 22 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
mehmet sinan ogun | Trustee | 22 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
BULENT AYGER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.31k | £0 | £1.31k | £1.35k | £3.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £917 | £0 | £917 | £1.64k | £4.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 March 2025 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 May 2024 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 MARCH 2005
Charitable objects
A) THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING ARE TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE TURKISH COMMUNITY IN THE UK WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING WITH VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE FACILITIES TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND TO ASSIST THEIR INTEGRATION INTO WIDER COMMUNITY SO THAT THEY MAY PARTICIPATE FULLY IN SOCIETY. B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ABOUT ALL ASPECTS OF TURKISH ARTS, CULTURE, HERITAGE AND LITERATURE AND THE PROMOTION OF ANNUAL FESTIVALS TO THAT END. C) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY OTHER PERSON OR BODY) FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE TRUSTEES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS D) TO ADMINISTER FUNDS TO VARIOUS CHARITABLE CAUSES. E) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT1
864-866 Hertford Road
ENFIELD
EN3 6UD
- Phone:
- 07979942435
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window