Financial history CAMBORNE CHRISTIAN SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1114339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £6.88k £1.69k £3.25k £6.03k £5.33k
Total expenditure £3.85k £4.21k £3.94k £4.68k £9.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A