SWINDON TAMIL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide social and cultural forum to integrate and celebrate multiculturalism and social harmony in Swindon To work with Swindon Borough Council to achieve its objective of harmony in ethnic diversity. To promote and celebrate the Tamil Cultutre amongst all sections of the community in Swindon: Tamil Language classes South Indian Classical Music , Dance & Violin cllasses Family Learning
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 28 June 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAM THIAGARAJAH | Chair | 11 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ketha Ravi | Trustee | 11 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
SIVASANKARAN MURUGESAN | Trustee | 11 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
NALAYNI JEEVAKUMAR | Trustee | 11 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ranasingam Sakthivel | Trustee | 11 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kavitha Sathyadevan | Trustee | 11 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.20k | £44.22k | £38.30k | £37.97k | £36.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.57k | £31.91k | £22.63k | £27.02k | £42.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 JANUARY 2006 AS AMENDED 3 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
* THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF TAMIL PEOPLE RESIDING IN SWINDON, WILTSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE PROVISION OF TAMIL LANGUAGE CLASSES * TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THOSE WHO NEED THEM BECAUSE OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS IN LIFE * TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN THE TAMIL LANGUAGE AND CULTURE, MUSIC, DANCE AND DRAMA
Area of benefit
SWINDON, WILTSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Swindon Tamil Association
Park South Community Hall
Cranmore Avenue
SWINDON
SN3 2ES
- Phone:
- 01793487471
- Email:
- swindontamils@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window