Trustees The Josephine Wolf Trust

Charity number: 1117706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Henry Augustus Stedman Smithers Trustee 19 May 2023
None on record
Brendan O'Keefe Trustee 13 October 2020
None on record
Shelley LaRose Trustee 07 July 2020
None on record
HUBERT ANSELL CLARKE Trustee 15 October 2019
None on record
DAVID SIMPSON Trustee 05 May 2016
DATCHET UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time