COLLINS & CO MINORITY RESOURCE AND LEGAL ADVOCACY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LIASING WITH THE COMMUNITY IN PROVIDING LEGAL, HEALTH, EMPLOYMENT, COUNCELLING AND ADVICE SERVICES TO THEM.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 August 2006: Standard registration
- 09 October 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 25 November 2011: Re-registered
- 14 October 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 17 December 2013: Re-registered
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DANIEL McCUE | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.20k | £17.00k | £14.00k | £38.00k | £23.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.00k | £16.70k | £13.70k | £37.31k | £22.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 06 February 2025 | 343 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 446 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 13 July 2022 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 22 August 2021 | 175 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONGST ASYLUM SEEKERS AND REFUGEES FROM WHATEVER PART OF AFRICA AND ANY PART OF THE WORLD, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF LEGAL ADVICE, REPRESENTATION AND ADVOCACY AND SUCH OTHER SERVICES AS THE CHARITY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Duke House
15 Seymour Street
London
SE18 6SX
- Phone:
- 0204-5292626
- Email:
- services.collins@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window