HOME-START HARWICH

Charity number: 1113984
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Home-Start offers friendship and informal support to parents with young children, in local communities throughout the UK so that every child can have a good start in life. Home-Start Harwich supports local families by means of a family group as well as a home visiting service by volunteers.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £355,787
Total expenditure: £298,506

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 May 2006: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CATHERINE OFFORD Chair
None on record
Paul Kinzett Trustee 06 February 2023
None on record
Lucy Mann Trustee 31 May 2016
None on record
PAULENE FORD Trustee 24 January 2012
None on record
ROBERTA THOMPSON Trustee
None on record
RICHARD COLLEY Trustee
THE GOVERNORS' BUILDING FUND FOR ST JOSEPH'S SCHOOL
Received: On time
HARWICH CONNEXIONS COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
THE BASIL SLAUGHTER TRUST FOR ADULT EDUCATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £166.71k £249.08k £216.87k £251.60k £355.79k
Total expenditure £168.02k £174.72k £191.89k £237.77k £298.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £244.03k £211.14k £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 26 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 March 2024 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 08 February 2024 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST. NICHOLAS HALL
STOUR ROAD
HARWICH
ESSEX
CO12 3HS
Phone:
01255556230