Financial history City of Wrexham Brass Band

Charity number: 1114998
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £25.59k £46.04k £29.77k £22.01k £18.36k
Total expenditure £26.99k £42.30k £29.45k £22.88k £18.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £3.00k N/A £1.50k