BEEP Doctors (BASICS Cumbria) Ltd

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BEEP Doctors is a charity providing enhanced pre-hospital emergency medical care to people in Cumbria.Our team of doctors are on call 24/7, attending serious incidents including road traffic collisions, farming accidents and other life threatening emergencies. BEEP covers all of Cumbria from Whitehaven in the West, Brampton in the East, North to the Scottish Borders and South to Barrow-in-Furness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 22 March 2006: Standard registration
- BEEP Doctors (BASICS Cumbria) Ltd (Working name)
- BEEP FUND LIMITED (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Graeme Spencer | Chair | 25 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Tom Hoather | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Douglas Gwyn Davies | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Moss | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Angus Mitchell | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Paul O'Connor | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Philip Spencer | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vincent Romano | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MITCHELL IRVING | Trustee | 25 October 2012 |
|
|||||
Dr Theodore Weston MBE,MBBS | Trustee |
|
||||||
COLIN MAUGHAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.41k | £50.54k | £195.29k | £282.93k | £171.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.28k | £37.82k | £83.61k | £133.78k | £158.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 DECEMBER 2004 as amended on 25 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
SEE GOVERNING DOCUMENT
Area of benefit
PENRITH, CUMBRIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
BEEP Doctors (BASICS Cumbria) Ltd.
First Floor
Agriculture House
Cromwell Road
Penrith
Cumbria
- Phone:
- 01768 809 535
- Email:
- info@beepdoctors.co.uk
- Website:
-
Beepdoctors.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window