Financial history HINDU SANSKAR RADIO

Charity number: 1117667
Charity reporting is up to date (53 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £68.19k £81.24k £65.90k £55.25k £49.55k
Total expenditure £67.94k £59.29k £59.50k £59.86k £59.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A