HINDU SANSKAR RADIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main aim of our society is to broadcast religious, cultural and social programs. We broadcast programs on DAB Radio Channel A Plus & on line "Sanskarradio.com" throughout the year from 5am to 10pm.Three times a year we broadcast till midnight to celebrate the Hindu festivals MAHA SHIVRATRI, JANMASHTMI AND DIWALI. All the presenters serve the community without any monetary reward.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicester City
Governance
- 24 January 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAHESH CHANDER PRASHER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
NARENDRAKUMAR LALJI BHAWANJI WAGHELA | Trustee | 21 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
SAJAN ODEDRA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.19k | £81.24k | £65.90k | £55.25k | £49.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.94k | £59.29k | £59.50k | £59.86k | £59.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 March 2025 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 March 2025 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 April 2024 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 April 2024 | 73 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 April 2023 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 April 2023 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 July 2022 | 172 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 July 2022 | 172 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LEICESTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY RADIO AS A RECREATIONAL FACILITY FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
LEICESTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
SCRAPTOFT LODGE FARM
BEEBY ROAD
SCRAPTOFT
LEICESTER
LEICESTERSHIRE
LE7 9SJ
- Phone:
- 07813933047
- Email:
- narendra@waghelas.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window