THE IFAKARA BAKERY PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preservation and protection of health particularly but not exclusively by providing, or assisting in the provision of free bread to the community of Ifakara in Tanzania. The relief of financial hardship and advancement of education in Ifakara by supporting young people and such projects as the trustees determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Derby City
- Dudley
- Gloucestershire
- Nottinghamshire
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Warwickshire
- Tanzania
Governance
- 03 June 2006: Standard registration
- THE IFAKARA BAKERY PROJECT AND FREE BREAD FUNDS - TANZANIA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev SIOR COLEMAN | Chair |
|
||||||
Martin Siyovelwa | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Benjamin Schellenberg | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dee Johnson | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robin Johnson | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Annabelle Elizabeth Schellenberg | Trustee | 31 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
GEORGINA ELIZABETH ARNOLD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.93k | £38.15k | £33.73k | £40.59k | £30.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.49k | £24.32k | £35.40k | £27.00k | £42.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 December 2021 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 December 2021 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 December 2020 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13 MAY 2006
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS: (I) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FREE BREAD TO THE COMMUNITY OF IFAKARA IN AFRICA (II) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN IFAKARA BY SUPPORTING YOUNG PEOPLE AND SUCH PROJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
IFAKARA, AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 KINGSHILL DRIVE
BIRMINGHAM
B38 8SA
- Phone:
- 0121 4585488
- Email:
- contact@bakeryfund.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window