FRIENDS SUPPORTING FRIENDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assisting self-help fundraising by groups to support friends and/or family to finance non-NHS provided medical health care
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 May 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SANTOSH MALL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
BENJAMIN TUDUR LLYWELYN PREECE SMITH | Trustee |
|
||||||
PALWINDER RANDHAWA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AMANDA MACFARLANE BATEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.19k | £9.47k | £1.24k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.33k | £15.53k | £211 | £2.14k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 200 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 200 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 566 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 566 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 931 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 931 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1296 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1296 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1661 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1661 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 DECEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OR SICKNESS AND/OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE LIVING IN ENGLAND AND WALES BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR MEDICAL TREATMENT AND RELATED EXPENSES WHICH IS NOT ORDINARILY AVAILABLE THROUGH THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE. MEDICAL TREATMENT MUST BE PROVIDED BY RECOGNISED MEDICAL PROFESSIONALS AND MAY INCLUDE PALLIATIVE CARE
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 CLIFTON PARK ROAD
CAVERSHAM
READING
RG4 7PD
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window