EVENT MEDIA PROJECTS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDING PUBLIC AMENITIES IN THE COMMUNITY FOR ART. DIRECTOR COLM LALLY COLLABORATES WITH ARTISTS, ACADEMICS AND VARIOUS CULTURAL AGITATORS TO CREATE TEMPORARY CONTEXTS AROUND THE ARTWORKS AND IDEAS IN CIRCULATION. THE PROGRAMME EMERGES THROUGH MEETINGS AND DISCUSSIONS IN THE LOCAL SCENE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 April 2007: Standard registration
- 22 July 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 30 September 2009: Standard registration
- 30 August 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2013 | 30/11/2014 | 30/11/2015 | 30/11/2016 | 30/11/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.89k | £22.23k | £11.02k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.55k | £19.31k | £12.82k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 January 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2017 | 11 August 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2016 | 16 August 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2015 | 26 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 NOVEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY FACILITATING, PROMOTING AND PROVIDING FOR SKILL DEVELOPMENT, WORKING EXPERIENCE, EDUCATIONAL WORKSHOPS AN LEARNING, AND PROVIDING PUBLIC AMENITIES IN THE COMMUNITY FOR ART, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO ARCHITECTURE, INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY, SCIENCE-BASED ART, PRINTING, PUBLISHING AND MULTIMEDIA, IN PARTICULAR FOR RESIDENTS OF TOWER HAMLETS AND THE USERS OF THE CHARITY'S FACILITIES; B) TO PROMOTE ART FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY ENCOURAGING THE DEVELOPMENT, DISPLAY AND DISTRIBUTION OF EMERGING ART PRACTISES AND PROVIDING PREMISES, FACILITIES (INCLUDING INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY) AND AMENITIES FOR THE PROMOTION OF THOSE PRACTICES; AND C) THE PROMOTION OF SUCH OTHER PURPOSES BEING EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window