THE TENNISMANIA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of the Charity are set out in the Trustees' Report sent to the Charity Commission on 9 March 2010
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2009
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 May 2008: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DANNY BUCK WARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROSALIND DIANIA SUTHERLAND EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK LACEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2009 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 275 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 275 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 641 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 641 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1006 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1006 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1371 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1371 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1736 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1736 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 SEPTEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF TUITION, FACILITIES, SUPPORT OR ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO PLAY TENNIS, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO INDIVIDUALS UNDER THE AGE OF EIGHTEEN WHO, DUE TO FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES OR DISABILITY WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO TAKE PART IN TENNIS AS A RECREATIONAL ACTIVITY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Baden Road
London
N8 7RJ
- Phone:
- 02083401280
- Email:
- etennismania@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window