THE SOUTH STANLEY PARTNERSHIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide employment enhancement opportunities such as C.V. writing, Job search and basic courses such as English, Maths and I.T. We also provide a wide range of activities for all members of our community.These include Keep fit, Seated exercise, Craft groups, Needle craft groups, Dog training, Zumba class, social club for adults with learning disabilities, War gaming club, and youth activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Durham
Governance
- 17 June 2006: Standard registration
- 19 November 2017: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 19 November 2017: Funds transferred to 1173940 THE SOUTH STANLEY PARTNERSHIP
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.27k | £30.65k | £44.02k | £23.91k | £37.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.56k | £27.96k | £51.21k | £38.09k | £33.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 21 March 2017 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 23 May 2017 | 112 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 03 June 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 09 March 2015 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2014
(These accounts |
15 June 2016 | 501 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 JANUARY 2006
Charitable objects
(A) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF SOUTH STANLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. (B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
SOUTH STANLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window