Accounts and annual returns HOLY TRINITY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1113383
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 08 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 08 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 December 2022 169 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 16 December 2022 169 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 March 2022 271 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 29 March 2022 272 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 March 2021 271 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 08 April 2021 282 days late Download Open in new window