MAGEN DAVID ADOM UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support Magen David Adom, Israel's only ambulance and medical emergency service. Magen David Adom is a non-Governmental, not for profit organisation that depends on support from donors around the world. Magen David Adom also works internationally to share its expertise around the world. Magen David Adom is a member of the International Federation of Red Cross and Red Crescent Societies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£16,964,884
Donations and legacies | £16.95m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £17.60k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£14,247,242
Raising funds | £1.31m | |
Charitable activities | £12.93m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.31m | |
Charitable expenditure | £12.93m | |
Retained for future use | £2.72m |
People

8 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnet
- Israel
Governance
- 23 March 2006: Standard registration
- 23 August 2024: Funds received from 1090043 THE HYAM SASSOON LEVI CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward Ziff OBE | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Adam Ilan Jacobson Mr | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|||||||
Marc Meyer | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
David Bernstien CBE | Trustee | 10 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Maurice Geller | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Barbara Dingle | Trustee | 05 May 2020 |
|
|||||||
Nicholas Sidney Springer | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Mark Ordever | Trustee | 08 August 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Marc Ian Franks | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Russell Jacobs | Trustee | 07 June 2017 |
|
|||||||
Patricia Abram | Trustee | 28 January 2015 |
|
|
||||||
DR DAVID JAMES CURTIS | Trustee | 27 December 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Professor ROBIN CHARLES ELLISON | Trustee | 24 April 2006 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.60m | £5.76m | £4.08m | £5.17m | £16.96m | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.22m | £7.09m | £7.17m | £5.64m | £14.25m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £7.59m | £5.75m | £4.08m | £5.17m | £16.95m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £13.49k | £8.28k | £16 | £120 | £17.60k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £4.58m | £801.58k | £1.61m | £758.80k | £952.69k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.48m | £5.82m | £6.63m | £4.87m | £12.93m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £740.90k | £1.27m | £535.51k | £768.47k | £1.31m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £45.53k | £74.11k | £76.64k | £6.72k | £20.28k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £50.83k | £36.98k | £24.15k | £16.33k | £9.42k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £7.59m | £7.17m | £3.73m | £3.64m | £8.48m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £779.16k | £1.68m | £1.30m | £1.68m | £3.80m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 FEBRUARY 2006 AS AMENDED 20 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST AT ALL TIMES MAGEN DAVID ADOM IN THE WORK OF PROVIDING MEDICAL CARE AND TREATMENT FOR PERSONS IRRESPECTIVE OF THEIR NATIONALITY, RACE OR RELIGION
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Magen David Adom Uk Ltd
Winston House
2 Dollis Park
LONDON
N3 1HF
- Phone:
- 02082015900
- Email:
- info@mdauk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window