STORRINGTON AREA RESPONDER TEAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
StART is a group of local residents who supply, install and maintain a number of defibrillators in and around the village of Storrington in West Sussex. These are installed in yellow weatherproof cabinets and are accessible 24/7. Training in CPR and in the use of the defibrillators is available via the contact telephone number in each of the defibrillator cabinets.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 22 August 2006: Standard registration
- START (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Edward Meadows | Chair | 07 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Irene Meadows | Trustee | 07 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA SYLVIA BELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8 | £951 | £3.69k | £1.32k | £2.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33 | £882 | £7.05k | £1.41k | £3.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 25 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 FEBRUARY 2006
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING INJURY OR ILLNESS IN THE PARISH OF STORRINGTON AND SULLINGTON AND OTHER ADJOINING AREAS SERVED BY THE SUSSEX AMBULANCE SERVICE NHS TRUST BY THE PROVISION OF EMERGENCY MEDICAL CARE.
Area of benefit
STORRINGTON, SULLINGTON AND ADJOINING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 Dean Way
Storrington
PULBOROUGH
West Sussex
RH20 4QN
- Phone:
- 01903417162
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window