Trustees HOME-START KETTERING AREA
Charity number: 1114030

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH WRIGHT | Chair | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marie Cox | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
ABBIE UNDERWOOD | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
BERNADETTE LEATHER | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
KELI RYAN WATTS | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA JAYNE HURRELL | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
RUTH WRIGHT | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER WILLIAM ARTHURS | Trustee | 07 January 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.