Accounts and annual returns THE VICKI ALEXANDER TRUST

Charity number: 1113565
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2011 28 October 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2010 06 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required