Accounts and annual returns Amin Welfare Foundation

Charity number: 1113372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 14 December 2024 17 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 14 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 14 December 2023 17 March 2025 154 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 14 December 2022 17 March 2025 520 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 14 December 2021 17 March 2025 885 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 14 December 2020 22 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 14 December 2020 Not Required