THE RODMERSHAM SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The restauration, preservation, repair, maintenance, improvement and beautification of the parish church of St Nicholas, Rodmersham in the diocese of Canterbury
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Kent
Governance
- 23 March 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM LESLIE HAGGAR | Chair | 24 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Bruce Pardoe | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MRS VICKY LUKEHURST | Trustee | 24 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
SALLY BEVAN | Trustee | 24 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA JOAN FISHER | Trustee | 24 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.49k | £3.19k | £841 | £1.90k | £5.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.86k | £7.67k | £0 | £2.98k | £615 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, REPAIR, MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND BEAUTIFICATION OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST NICHOLAS, RODMERSHAM IN THE DIOCESE OF CANTERBURY (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CHURCH") AND OF THE MONUMENTS, FITTINGS, FIXTURES, STAINED GLASS, FURNITURE, ORNAMENTS AND CHATTELS IN THE CHURCH AND CHURCHYARD BELONGING TO THE CHURCH.
Area of benefit
PARISH CHURCH OF ST NICHOLAS, RODMERSHAM IN THE DIOCESE OF CANTERBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church Cottage
Church Street
Rodmersham
Sittingbourne
ME9 0QD
- Phone:
- 01795472373
- Email:
- graham.haggar@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window