Financial history ISMAIL SHARIF AND FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1113651
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.94k £37.78k £17.34k £24.58k £17.82k
Total expenditure £17.74k £19.93k £7.20k £35.23k £29.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A