Financial history PORT

Charity number: 1114217
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.21k £39.68k £55.75k £32.72k £38.09k
Total expenditure £133.66k £839 £49.77k £585 £419
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A