PORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE & PROTECT THE PHYSICAL & MENTAL HEALTH OF UK SUFFERERS OF CHRONIC INTESTINAL PSEUDO OBSTRUCTION (CIPS), GASTROPARESIS & DYSMOTILITY LEADING TO INTESTINAL FAILURE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FUNDING FOR MEDICAL RESEARCH, SUPPORT ,EDUCATION & PRACTICAL ADVICE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO CIPS GASTROPARESIS & DYSMOTILITY LEADING TO INTESTINAL FAILURE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 May 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN STEWART | Chair | 16 May 2006 |
|
|
||||
ABIGAIL ANDREWS | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nigel John Meadows | Trustee | 07 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
BARRY JOHN STEWART | Trustee | 07 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY CARMICHAEL | Trustee | 10 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ashlee Johnson | Trustee | 08 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Kilian Fitzsimmons-Wilson | Trustee | 28 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA MARY STANIER | Trustee | 05 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
SONIA FROST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN FROST | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.21k | £39.68k | £55.75k | £32.72k | £38.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.66k | £839 | £49.77k | £585 | £419 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 FEBRUARY 2006.
Charitable objects
* TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF CHRONIC PSEUDO OBSTRUCTION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE. * TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO CHRONIC PSEUDO OBSTRUCTION * THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
STEEPLE LODGE
CHURCH LANE
DODDINGHURST
BRENTWOOD
CM15 0NJ
- Phone:
- 07939885699
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window